HI SB3081 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for locally produced, organic food. Exempts locally produced, organic food from the general excise tax.
Title
Relating To Taxation Of Locally Produced, Organic Food.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:20PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2156 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3081&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB3081_.HTM |