HI HB2156 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for locally produced, organic food. Exempts locally produced, organic food from the general excise tax.
Title
Relating To Taxation Of Locally Produced, Organic Food.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-20. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-07-20 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3081 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2156&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2156_.HTM |