HI SB3079 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 269-6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to clarify that the Public Utilities Commission shall consider the effect of the State's reliance on fossil fuels on lifecycle greenhouse gas emissions and may require a lifecycle greenhouse gas emissions analysis for energy projects that do not involve the combustion of fuel. Makes conforming amendments. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2533) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-12-24 1:32PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-09-24 1:06PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPN. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2390 (Same As) 2024-06-21 - Act 054, 06/20/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154).