HI HB2390 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Act 054, 06/20/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Act 054, 06/20/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Public Utilities Commission to explicitly consider the effect of the State's reliance on fossil fuels on lifecycle greenhouse gas emissions and gives the Public Utilities Commission the discretion to waive a lifecycle greenhouse gas emissions assessment for energy projects that do not involve combustion. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Senate | Act 054, 06/20/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154). |
2024-06-21 | House | Act 054, on 06/20/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154). |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kong voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 50-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 50-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Keohokalole, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima, Cochran, Sayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 9:00AM; Conference Room 325. |
2024-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 727). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Rhoads. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Cochran, Sayama, Ward. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2024-04-05 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 481) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3414) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-27-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3070) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPN. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 367). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 907-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 388-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3079 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.