HI SB3070 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-20 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 1:45PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-20 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 1:45PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Teacher Stipend Program to be administered by the Department of Education to address the shortage of teachers in the Hawaii public school system. Creates the Hawaii Teacher Stipend Program Special Fund to provide ongoing funding of stipends to students in the stipend program or successor programs. Appropriates funds. (SB3070 HD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 1:45PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-18 3:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Hashem, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 555). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 416). |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1814-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5). |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1275-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Ing, McKelvey. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 409) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2796) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2280) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 2:51PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |