HI SB307 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB307
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes any firearm or rifle with the capacity to fire ammunition of fifty caliber or higher except shotguns and muzzle-loading firearms in the list of prohibited weapons. Takes effect 5/6/2137. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 192) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Gabbard, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) with Senator Fevella voting "No". |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 699) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB251 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB307 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 22
SB307 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 22