HI HB251 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB251
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes any firearm or rifle with the capacity to fire ammunition of fifty caliber or higher in the list of prohibited weapons.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB307 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB251 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
HB251 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=251&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB251_.HTM |