HI SB3060 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Planning and Sustainable Development to develop and publish a statewide climate adaptation and resilience implementation plan. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To A Climate Adaption And Resilience Implementation Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 255) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3017) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2615) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL/EET, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2371 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3