HI SB3054 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the membership of the Hawaii Interagency Council for Transit-Oriented Development to replace the Director of Law Enforcement with the Director of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Transit-oriented Development Planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2318) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 1:10PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2365 (Same As) 2024-05-29 - Act 028, 05/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1128).