HI SB3041 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health care professionals to take a continuing medical education course in health issues unique to Hawaii. Requires the DOH to develop the course, in consultation with the Hawaii medical board.
Title
Health Care Professionals; Continuing Medical Education
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2233 (Same As) 2016-06-23 - Act 115, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3041&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB3041_.HTM |