HI SB3037 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the University of Hawaii, in collaboration with the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism, to fund one or more programs sponsored or organized by the University of Hawaii community colleges or a four-year campus to implement international college experiences for Hawaii students enrolled at a University of Hawaii campus. (SB3037 HD1)
Title
Relating To International Education Programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HED/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1440-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Woodson. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED/VMI on Thursday, 03-15-18 2:20PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HED/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 400) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2785) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from JDC/ETT/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2469) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/ETT/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDC/ETT/HRE, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2604 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).