HI HB2604 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the University of Hawaii, in collaboration with the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to fund one or more programs sponsored or organized by the University of Hawaii community colleges or a four-year campus to implement international college experiences for Hawaii students enrolled at a University of Hawaii campus. (HB2604 HD2)
Title
Relating To International Education Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 736-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-15-18 10:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on VMI with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 241-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to VMI. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ing, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Learmont, Quinlan, Matsumoto. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-18. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HED, VMI, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3037 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).