HI SB3024 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces and sets fixed interest rates for loans under the Agricultural Loan Program.
Title
Relating To Agricultural Loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2401) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2335 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).