HI SB3023 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to LAT, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to LAT, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Real Estate Commission to revoke or suspend a license, or fine a licensee, for advertising, promoting, representing, receiving any remuneration for, or offering for rent any transient vacation units and whole-home short-term rentals unless the unit or rental is permitted by the relevant county. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Real Estate Brokers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to LAT, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 407) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2955) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2399) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to CPN/EET, JDC. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Illegal Transient Vacation Units
Prohibition
Real Estate Brokers
Real Estate Commission
Whole-Home Short-Term Rentals
Prohibition
Real Estate Brokers
Real Estate Commission
Whole-Home Short-Term Rentals