HI SB3023 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - (S) The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - (S) The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the streamlining and facilitation of the permitting process if for the restoration of Hawaiian fishponds (loko ia). Allows for the commercial use of the fishponds if the applicant is a lineal or cultural descendant of Native Hawaiians or a Native Hawaiian organization. Amends the definition of "mariculture" for chapters 171 and 190D, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to exclude Hawaiian fishponds from certain lease provisions.
Title
Hawaiian Fishponds; Loko ia; Restoration; Permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | (S) The committee on AGL deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) The committee on HWN deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-12 3:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to HWN/AGL, WLH. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3023 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB3023_.HTM |