HI SB3019 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the issuance of new building permits unless it is established that the building will be furnished with equipment that allows for the collection and use of gray water for irrigation. Provides for exemptions.
Title
Gray Water; New Building Permit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee on WLA deferred the measure. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-16 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WLA/EET, PSM/GVO. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2476 (Same As) 2016-02-01 - Referred to WAL, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3019&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB3019_.HTM |