HI HB2476 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to WAL, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to WAL, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the issuance of new building permits unless it is established that the building will be furnished with equipment that allows for the collection and use of gray water for irrigation. Provides for exemptions.
Title
Gray Water; New Building Permit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3019 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2476&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2476_.HTM |