HI SB2958 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Act 178, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Act 178, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends or repeals various provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes or the Session Laws of Hawaii for the purposes of correcting errors and references, clarifying language, or deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Statutory Revision: Amending Or Repealing Various Provisions Of The Hawaii Revised Statutes Or The Session Laws Of Hawaii For The Purposes Of Correcting Errors And References, Clarifying Language, Or Deleting Obsolete Or Unnecessary Provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | Act 178, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279). |
2024-07-03 | House | Act 178, on 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 696). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Ihara. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-18-24. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-24. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-04-24 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Takayama, Souza. |
2024-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 366). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 541). |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki, Todd, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1580-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 41). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2766) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2660 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3