HI SB2950 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the inspection fee for imported freight from seventy-five cents per thousand pounds to five cents per pound. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Inspection Fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2594) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-14-22 2:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |