HI SB2938 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the state fuel tax to generate additional revenues for the state highway fund by amending section 243-4, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Allows for an increase in the state motor vehicle registration fee and increases the amount of the fee to be deposited into the state highway fund by amending section 249-31, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Increases the state motor vehicle weight tax by amending section 249-33, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD2)
Title
Transportation; Liquid Fuel Tax; Motor Vehicle; Registration; Weight Tax; State Highway Fund; Operations; Maintenance ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-23-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 309) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 16; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Shimabukuro, Wakai . Noes, 8 (Senator(s) Espero, Green, Harimoto, Ihara, Kim, Ruderman, Slom, L. Thielen). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2814) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Riviere, Wakai ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-29-16 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2461) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2409 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4