HI HB2409 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the State Fuel Tax to generate additional revenues for the State Highway Fund by amending section 243-4, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Allows for increase in the state motor vehicle registration fee and deposits the money into the State Highway Fund by amending section 249-31, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Increases the state motor vehicle weight tax and deposits the money into the State Highway Fund by amending section 249-33, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Transportation; Liquid Fuel Tax; Motor Vehicle; Registration; Weight Tax; State Highway Fund; Operations; Maintenance ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2938 (Same As) 2016-03-23 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2409&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2409_.HTM |