HI SB2931 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to submit to the Legislature a copy of all reports written by the alcohol and drug abuse division, the adult mental health division, and the child and adolescent mental health division of the department of health pursuant to the USC Title 42, section 300x-1. (SD1)
Title
Department of Health; Federal Reports; Submission to Legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:05AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-09-10 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-05-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to HTH/HMS, WAM. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Introduced. |