HI SB293 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB293
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline for the Legislative Reference Bureau to submit the sunrise analysis required by Act 109, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, from 9/1/2019, to 11/13/2019.
Title
Relating To Family Leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB293 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
HB32 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 190, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
HB32 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 190, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=293&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB293_.HTM |