HI SB2919 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the dispensing of a pharmacist-prescribed opioid antagonist be reported to the State's electronic prescription accountability system. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Electronic Prescription Accountability System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1095-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ward. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-12-20 9:00AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 435) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3248) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:30PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from PSM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2622) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2363 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5