HI SB2919 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program to generate revenue through the lease of public library lands to meet the mission of the public libraries. Establishes the library facilities fund. Requires the state librarian and board of education to report to the legislature. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Public Libraries.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1258). |
2018-07-10 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1258). |
2018-06-25 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-18 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Say voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 91-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 91-18). |
2018-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Cullen, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, Tupola. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 1:45PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-18 3:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Rhoads, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Hashem, Tupola. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 536). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1915-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2018-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1414-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Kong, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, C. Lee, McKelvey. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Hashem, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Learmont, Onishi; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Ing, McKelvey, Ohno. |
2018-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/WAL on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EDN/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 362) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2720) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from EDU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2499) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 3:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDU/WTL, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |