HI SB2905 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DOE to submit an annual report to the legislature on the installation, repair, and maintenance of fire alarm systems in Hawaii's public schools. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Fire Alarms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1616 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2905&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2905_.HTM |