HI SB2901 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "commercial activity" within section 200-4(a), Hawaii Revised Statutes, as it relates to the chairperson of the board of land and natural resources' authority to adopt rules necessary to regulate commercial activities in state waters. (SD1)
Title
Commercial Activity for Ocean Recreation and Coastal Area Programs; Definition; Rulemaking Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from WLA/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2354) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Wakai. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WLA/CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2372 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).