HI HB2372 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of commercial activity for purposes of DLNR regulation of ocean and coastal recreation activities. Specifies that land-based retail, rental, and activity providers are not subject to DLNR regulation. (HB2372 HD2)
Title
Commercial Activity; Ocean Recreation and Coastal Area Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 596-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-17-16 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 121-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Ohno. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-16. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to EDB, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2901 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.