HI SB2873 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 312, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1429).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 312, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1429).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently amends chapter 343, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to clarify current exemptions for secondary actions and require the Office of Environmental Quality Control to determine which agency has the responsibility for determining whether an environmental assessment is required by the applicant except in situations involving exempt secondary actions. Repeals Act 87, Session Laws of Hawaii 2009, and Act 45, Session Laws of Hawaii 2011. (SB2873 CD2)
Title
Environmental Impact Statements; Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 312, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1429). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 312, on 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1429). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-04 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 728). | |
2012-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 839). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching, Hanohano, Riviere, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Floor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with Representative(s) Thielen voting no and none excused. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Floor Amendment No. 8 offered by Rep. Souki | |
2012-05-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Report filed. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Separated Committee Report. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Floor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Floor Amendment No. 11 offered. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 23-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 23-12). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, Ito, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 10:30AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 10:30AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-12 11:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 762). | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Ihara, Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Souki, Coffman, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Ito, Fontaine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 523). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Ching, Fontaine, Hanohano, Johanson, M. Lee, Marumoto, Rhoads, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Riviere, Thielen voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12 | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1537-12) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Ito, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Luke, McKelvey, Marumoto. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-29-12 2:20PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-29-12. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-27-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ching, Marumoto, Pine voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Riviere, Thielen voting no (2) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1285-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Cabanilla, Chang, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Riviere, Thielen; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Herkes, Ito. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-20-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 978-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-12-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to TRN, EEP, JUD, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 351) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2446) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-12 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to ENE. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2611 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to ENE.