HI HB2611 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to ENE.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to ENE.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Temporarily amends Chapter 343, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to clarify current exemptions for secondary actions limited to development within existing public right-of-ways or highways. Requires that applicants prepare environmental assessments when required. Effective January 7, 2059. Repeal on July 1, 2059. (HB2611 HD2)
Title
Environmental Impact Statements, Exceptions
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to ENE. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 268). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ching voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, Riviere, Thielen voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 917-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Thielen; and 1 Excused: Herkes. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision-making on Thursday, 03-01-12 2:01PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-01-12. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-21-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Belatti, Ching, Hanohano, Riviere voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Cabanilla, Chang, Har, Ito, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Carroll, Riviere; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-14-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Okamura, Saiki. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-01-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Re-referred to TRN, EEP, JUD, referral sheet 9 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2873 (Same As) 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 312, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1429).