HI SB287 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB287
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of transportation and the counties to implement a vision zero program in Hawaii by 7/1/2022. Establishes a goal of no traffic fatalities or serious injuries by 2045. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Vision Zero.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1037) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-17 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Matsumoto. |
2021-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 189) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 839) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 506) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-11-21 3:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB287 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
HB604 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB604 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1