HI SB287 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning with the primary election in 2016, requires the office of elections to implement election by mail in a county with a population of fewer than 100,000. Beginning with the 2018 primary election, implement election by mail in each county with a population of fewer than 500,000. Thereafter, election by mail is required for all elections. Provides places of deposit for personal delivery of mail-in ballots and ensures a limited number of voter service centers in each county to remain open on the day of election to allow voters with special needs to vote and receive personal delivery of absentee, permanent absentee, and mail-in ballots. Beginning on January 1, 2018, the voter service center shall enable the eligible voter to register to vote on the day of the election. Makes conforming amendments for procedures to postpone elections and the disclosure of the election result in the event of a natural disaster; and the allocation of election expenses between the State and counties. Appropriates funds for the implementation and administration of the election by mail program. (SB287 HD2)
Title
Elections; Voting; Elections by Mail; Absentee Voting; Postponed Elections and Election Results; Election Expenses; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Cullen Co-Chairs; C. Lee, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 501). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1590) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1197) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 103) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Inouye, Kahele, Kidani, Kouchi, Nishihara, Shimabukuro, Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 706) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 278) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-10-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |