HI SB2855 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:35pm in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:35pm in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation to enable the Department of Health to continue providing developmental disabilities services to eligible Compact of Free Association adults and children. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2855 HD1)
Title
Emergency Appropriation; Developmental Disabilities; COFA ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:35pm in conference room 229. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:35PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 8:50AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Luke Co-Chairs; Hashem, Fukumoto Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Chun Oakland Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1653-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Fale, Ing, C. Lee, Saiki, Takai excused (6). |
2014-03-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 985-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-12-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 311) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2555) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2228) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-14 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2305 (Same As) 2014-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).