HI SB2853 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that land accreted after May 20, 2003, shall be public land except as otherwise provided by law.
Title
Accreted Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee on JDL has rescheduled its decision making to 02-16-12 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-16-12 4:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-16-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to WLH/JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2591 (Same As) 2012-04-24 - (S) Act 056, 4/23/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1156).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2853 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2853_.htm |