HI SB2843 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the license fee for wholesalers or dealers of cigarettes and tobacco products. Increases the excise tax on cigarettes and tobacco products. (SB2843 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
2018-03-23HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1405-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-03-20HouseThe committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 03-20-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 36
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 332) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-03-06SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 17; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Kim . Noes, 8 (Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Harimoto, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Ruderman, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2018-03-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2652) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2018-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Inouye, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
2018-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to WAM.
2018-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2083 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 7

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback