HI SB2834 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes programs for the production and processing of hemp in Hawaii.
Title
Relating To Hemp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 1:50PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM/JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2278 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2834&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2834_.HTM |