HI SB2823 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to LHE, FIN , referral sheet 36
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to LHE, FIN , referral sheet 36
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the President of the University of Hawaii from serving concurrently as a campus chancellor. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The President Of The University Of Hawaii System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN , referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 384) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kim. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Moriwaki, Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) S. Chang). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3360) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-20 11:05AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2829) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-20 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |