HI SB2809 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 095, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 095, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Aligns statutory language regarding utility ratemaking with widely accepted utility ratemaking principles and ratemaking practices already applied in Hawaii by allowing utilities in the State the opportunity to earn a fair return on utility property that is "used and useful" for public utility purposes. (CD1)
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Utility Ratemaking; Used; Useful
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Act 095, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196). |
2014-06-18 | House | Act 095, on 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196). |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 8-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 8-14). |
2014-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Lowen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-14 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Kawakami, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Lowen, Yamashita, Thielen Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-14 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1534-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1199-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-14. |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-17-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 292) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2803) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-14 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2215) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2260 (Same As) 2014-02-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.