HI SB2807 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Act 058, on 06/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Act 058, on 06/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidates the Office of Information Management and Technology and the Information and Communication Services Division of the Department of Accounting and General Services, including all related information technology functions, in the Office of Enterprise Technology Services under the direction of the Chief Information Officer. Takes effect on 7/2/2016. (SD2)
Title
Consolidation of the Office of Information Management and Technology and the Information and Communication Services Division
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | House | Act 058, on 06/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159). |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Act 058, 06/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 664). |
2016-04-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1769-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Ward. |
2016-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-22-16 2:10PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1249-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Yamane. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-16 2:00PM. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 258) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2781) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-29-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2404) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-11-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET/GVO, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2278 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Tokioka excused (2).