HI SB2806 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the membership of the King Kamehameha Celebration Commission. Provides the chairperson of the commission with the authority to establish an advisory committee composed of past commission members to advise the chairperson on the historical and archival background of the commission. Amends the support staff functions. Amends the mission and purpose of the commission. (SD1)
Title
King Kamehameha Celebration Commission; Department of Accounting and General Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2298) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, English, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2277 (Same As) 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).