HI HB2277 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the membership, mission, and purpose of the King Kamehameha Celebration Commission. Authorizes the Chairperson to appoint an advisory committee for historical and archival matters. Authorizes the Commission to appoint an Executive Director. (HB2277 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

King Kamehameha Celebration Commission; DAGS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-11SenateVetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).
2016-07-11HouseVetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).
2016-06-27HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1227)
2016-06-27SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227)
2016-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2016-05-05SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
2016-05-04HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
2016-05-03HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2016-05-03SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2016-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
2016-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 49-16).
2016-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
2016-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 49-16) as amended in (CD 1).
2016-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2016-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Ito, Lowen, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2016-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 1:00PM in conference room 423.
2016-04-20SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 1:00PM in conference room 423.
2016-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
2016-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).
2016-04-18HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Ing, Ito, Lowen Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Ward.
2016-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Inouye.
2016-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 468).
2016-04-08HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2016-04-07HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 474) in amended form (SD 1).
2016-04-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
2016-04-06SenateOne Day Notice 04-07-16.
2016-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3349) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2016-03-30SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Slom.
2016-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2016-03-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2016-03-24SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3075) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2016-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kim.
2016-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-16 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2016-03-10SenateReferred to HWN, WAM.
2016-03-10SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-03-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 279).
2016-03-08HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2016-03-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 968-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2016-03-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2016-03-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2016-02-19HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
2016-02-19HouseReported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 507-16), recommending referral to FIN.
2016-02-16HouseThe committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Matsumoto.
2016-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Tuesday, 02-16-16 10:00AM in House conference room 312.
2016-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on VMI with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).
2016-02-09HouseReported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 115-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to VMI.
2016-02-03HouseThe committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2016-02-02HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2016-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-03-16 10:15AM in House conference room 325.
2016-01-29HouseReferred to OMH, VMI, FIN, referral sheet 4
2016-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2016-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2806 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback