HI SB2804 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds up to $10,000,000 to assist Big Island Dairy, LLC for the planning, design, and construction of a new milking facility. (SD2)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Big Island Dairy, LLC ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 256) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2530) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2089) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2275 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.