HI SB2783 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-26 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-26 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within DOE the youth civil defense corps. Requires BOE to adopt standards and curriculum for student participation.
Title
Youth Civil Defense Corps; Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/PSM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1706 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2783&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2783_.HTM |