HI SB2756 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Public Utilities Commission to establish an annual two-tier inflationary cost index rate adjustment for water carriers based on automatic annual increases or a justified increase based on actual costs and performance. Establishes a water carrier agricultural cargo shipping subsidy with an annual rate increase. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Water Carriers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2671) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-15-22 3:35PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, CPN/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Agricultural Subsidy Program
Appropriation ($)
Department of Transportation
Harbors Division
Public Utilities Commission
Rate Increases
Water Carriers
Appropriation ($)
Department of Transportation
Harbors Division
Public Utilities Commission
Rate Increases
Water Carriers