HI SB27 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB27
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services (DHS) to restore basic adult dental benefits to Medicaid enrollees. Requires DHS to obtain the maximum federal matching funds available for this expenditure. (SB27 HD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation To Restore Basic Adult Dental Benefits To Medicaid Enrollees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3). |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1215) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-17 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Har, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Tupola. |
2017-03-15 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 03-17-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 75) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 655) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-23-17 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB27 (Carry Over) 2017-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).