HI SB2693 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures funds are available for future fiscal emergencies by creating the State Fiscal Stabilization Fund in the Constitution and requiring five percent of general fund end of year balances to be deposited into it.
Title
Constitutional Amendment; State Fiscal Stabilization Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-09-10 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-05-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to HMS/HTH, JGO/WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2540 (Same As) 2010-01-27 - (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2693&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2693_.htm |