HI SB2672 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Re-Referred to EDU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Re-Referred to EDU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state librarian to decline to conduct a requested review of an item within the Hawaii State Public Library System collection if the item was previously reviewed by the system in good faith, the basis for the request is duplicative or substantially similar to the basis for the prior review, the response to the prior review was issued within the last year, and the state librarian determines that it is unlikely that the library's response would differ from response issued for the prior request.
Title
Relating To Libraries.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Board of Education
Collection Development
Duplicative or Substantially Similar Requests
HSPLS
Review of Materials
Collection Development
Duplicative or Substantially Similar Requests
HSPLS
Review of Materials
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2672&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2672_.HTM |