HI SB2659 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Act 128, 06/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Act 128, 06/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporates a regenerative framework into the Hawaii State Planning Act by expanding objectives and policies for the visitor industry. Requires periodic updates to the Tourism Functional Plan, specifies elements to be included in the Tourism Functional plan, and requires an update to the Tourism Functional Plan to be submitted to the Legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the Regular Session of 2025. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Regenerative Tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Senate | Act 128, 06/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229). |
2024-07-01 | House | Act 128, on 06/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229). |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 88-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 88-24). |
2024-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Lamosao, Holt, La Chica, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 325. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 325. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 10:00AM; CR 325. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Inouye, Wakai Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Lamosao Co-Chairs; Holt, La Chica, Pierick. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 674). |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1801-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2024-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 4:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5). |
2024-03-15 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Kong, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica, Lamosao. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 03-12-24 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 168) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3010) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2577) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii Tourism Authority
Objectives and Policies
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Tourism Functional Plan
Visitor Industry
Objectives and Policies
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Tourism Functional Plan
Visitor Industry