HI SB2644 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Re-referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 38
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a provider of broadband internet access services to be transparent with network management practices, performance, and commercial terms of its broadband internet access services. Prohibits a provider of broadband internet access services from blocking lawful websites, impairing or degrading lawful internet traffic, engaging in paid prioritization, or unreasonably interfering with or disadvantaging users of broadband internet access services. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Broadband Service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseRe-referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 38
2018-03-08HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 36
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 244) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-03-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2602) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2018-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2018-02-16SenateReported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2497) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2018-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen.
2018-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-18 1:30PM in conference room 414.
2018-01-29SenateRe-Referred to ETT, CPH.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to ETT/PSM, CPH.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2256 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 8

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback