HI HB2256 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 8
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a provider of broadband internet access services to be transparent with network management practices, performance, and commercial terms of its broadband internet access services. Prohibits a provider of broadband internet access services from blocking lawful websites, impairing or degrading lawful internet traffic, engaging in paid prioritization, or interfering with or disadvantaging users of broadband internet access services. Requires an applicant of a broadband-related permit seeking a state-granted or county-granted right to attach small cell or other broadband wireless communication devices to utility poles to comply with certain practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Broadband Service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 8
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2644 (Same As) 2018-03-12 - Re-referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 38

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback